Wang, Yingyu (CPSO#: 101109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uhn Toronto Western Hospital
Department Of Cardiology
East Wing 5-559
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wang ( CPSO# 101109)

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Cardiology
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 5-559
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Business Address:
280 West Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z1
Phone Number: (905) 709-3690

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YINGYU WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017