skip to content

Wang, Xu

CPSO#: 96134

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Peking Union Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street, Kitchener, ON
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: 519-804-9234
Fax: 519-804-2604 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Canada
Phone: 519-888-4096
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Xu Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 96134 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:18 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XU WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
AVP - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 25 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015