skip to content

Wang, Qi

CPSO#: 96341

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Block Line Medical Clinic
Suite 201
1450 Block Line Road
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener ON  N2C 0A5
Phone: (519) 578-4450
Fax: (519) 579-1142 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Qi Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Wang ( CPSO# 96341 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1450 Block Line Road
Kitchener ON  N2C 0A5
Phone Number: (519) 578-4450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2014