skip to content

Wang, Li

CPSO#: 89236

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:China Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective:22 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 23 Dec 2011 to 22 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 23 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2013