skip to content

Wang, Henry

CPSO#: 33055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jan 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 320
679 Davis Dr.
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 853-2855
Fax: (905) 853-2813 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wang ( CPSO# 33055 )

Business Address:
320 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 853-2855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HENRY WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1982