skip to content

Wang, Hao

CPSO#: 93439

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H H S C
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 521 2100 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Canada
Phone: 519-742-0495
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wang ( CPSO# 93439 )

Business Address:
H H S C
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAO WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2018