skip to content

Wanes Hana, Maha Ramses

CPSO#: 84762

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215 Van Buren Street
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-2486
Fax: 6132584183 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wanes Hana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wanes Hana ( CPSO# 84762 )

Business Address:
215 Van Buren Street
Ottawa ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-5131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHA RAMSES WANES HANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANES HANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 09 Apr 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011