skip to content

Wan, Vera Ann

CPSO#: 86790

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Kwinecki, Vera Ann (used until: 19 Jun 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montabello Medical Clinic
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone: (905) 685-6555
Fax: (905) 685-6558 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Wan & V. Wan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wan ( CPSO# 86695 )
Dr. V. Wan ( CPSO# 86790 )

Business Address:
Montebello Medical Clinic
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone Number: (905) 685-6555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VERA ANN WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010