skip to content

Ateyah, Wameed

CPSO#: 81914

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 06 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wameed Ateyah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ateyah ( CPSO# 81914 )

Business Address:
34 Main Street West
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone Number: (905) 939-4600

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record with Dr. Ateya may send a fax to (905-939-4602) or send an e-mail to [email protected]
Date Received: 17 May 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Complaints Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 2021
Summary:

On April 5, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, 
 allegations of family physician Dr. Ateyah’s professional misconduct. The hearing 
 proceeded in the presence of Dr. Ateyah, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. 
 Ateyah. The allegations related to Dr. Ateyah’s interactions with and care of Patient A, 
 his communications with Patient A’s family member after Patient A complained to the 
 College, his interactions with Patient B, his communications with Patient B’s family 
 member after Patient B complained to the College, and his breach of a term, condition 
 or limitation on his undertaking to the College. Dr. Ateyah pleaded no contest to the 
 facts contained in a Statement of Uncontested Facts on Liability, and did not contest 
 that, based on those facts, he had engaged in professional misconduct. 
  
 On the basis of the Statement of Uncontested Facts on Liability, the Committee found 
 that Dr. Ateyah committed an act of professional misconduct in that: he engaged in an 
 act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional; he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession; and he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of 
 registration. 
  
 Disposition 
  
 Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, and a joint submission 
 from the parties as to an appropriate penalty in this case, the Discipline Committee 
 ordered and directed: 

    •  Dr. Ateyah attend before the Committee to be reprimanded 
    •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Ateyah’s certificate of registration for 12 months, 
       commencing on April 6, 2021 
   •  The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Ateyah’s certificate of registration effective on April 6, 2021: 
             Dr. Ateyah, prior to his return to practice and at his own expense, shall 
             participate in and successfully complete individualized instruction in 
             professionalism and ethics, satisfactory to the College, with an instructor 
             approved by the College, who shall provide a summative report to the 
             College including whether Dr. Ateyah has successfully completed this 
            instruction  
   •  Dr. Ateyah pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000. 
  
 The Committee released its reasons for decision in this matter on June 18, 2021, and 
they are available via the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 5, 2021

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:

On July 19, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wameed Ateyah committed 
 an act of professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession. 

 On a morning of a date in October 2016, Patient A attended Dr. Ateyah’s office as a 
 walk-in patient. She complained of back pain and some vaginal itchiness. Dr. Ateyah 
 examined Patient A. 

 The Committee found that Dr. Ateyah did not clearly communicate to Patient A in 
 advance the type of examination he intended to perform or the reasons for the 
 examination. In the result, Patient A was confused and did not understand what Dr. 
 Ateyah was doing or why he was doing it during the initial examination on the 
 examination table. 

 The Committee found that Dr. Ateyah failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession in not clearly explaining to Patient A the type of examination he intended to 
 conduct before embarking on the examination, and the reasons for conducting that 
 examination. 

 On October 7, 2019, the Committee heard submissions on penalty. The Committee 
 reserved its penalty decision. 

 On December 23, 2019, the Committee released its penalty decision: 

The Committee orders and directs on the matter of penalty and costs that:  

1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Ateyah’s certificate of registration for a period of two months, 
commencing on January 6, 2020 at 12:01 a.m;  

2.    The Registrar place the following terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. Ateyah’s 
certificate of registration: 

(i)   Dr. Ateyah shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”, a copy of 
which is attached to this Order; 

(ii)  Dr. Ateyah will participate in the Saegis Successful Patient Interactions Course by 
receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any conditions or qualification. Dr. Ateyah will 
complete the Saegis course within 6 months of the date of this Order and will provide proof to 
the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant 
assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it.  

3.    Dr. Ateyah shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded; and 

4.    Dr. Ateyah shall pay to the College costs in the amount of $20,550.00 within 60 days of 
the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 14-18, 2018 penalty hearing date: October 7, 2019

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: December 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES
Wameed Ateyah was charged with the following offences:

1. 26 counts of Sexual Assault, between January 1, 2008 and December 9, 2020, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. 1 count of Sexual Exploitation of a young person, between August 1, 2017 and August 31, 2017, contrary to Section 153 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Failure to comply with Release Order, on or about October 4, 2020, contrary to Section 145 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: September 16, 2020; September 30, 2020; December 10, 2020
Place of charges: Newmarket, Ontario
York Regional Police

 

Source: Other
Active Date: October 2, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On September 30, 2020, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Wameed Ateyah:

1. Do not practice as a medical practitioner.
2. Reside with surety at specified address.
3. Notify specified officer in charge or designate of any change of address within 24 hours of such change.
4. Do not contact or communication in any way directly or indirectly physical or electronic with specified persons subject to certain specified exception.
5. Do not be within 100 metres of any place where he knows specified persons to be with certain specified exception.

On September 16, 2020, conditions of release were imposed on Wameed Ateyah. See PDF for full list.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: April 15, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wameed Ateyah to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 15, 2020:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Ateyah’s family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Ateyah must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Ateyah’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Ateyah must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Ateyah shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Ateyah must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Ateyah must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Dr. Ateyah will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 7 months.

Dr. Ateyah will engage in professional education, including in maintaining professional boundaries, appropriate technique and communication for intimate examinations, and medical record-keeping.

Dr. Ateyah’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 8, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective August 2, 2018, Dr. Ateyah has completed his SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)