Walton, Candice Perreault (CPSO#: 96723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1028 South bay road
Sudbury ON  P3B 1J2
Canada
Phone: 705-674-9252
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. P. Walton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walton ( CPSO# 96723 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
1028 South Bay Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6J7
Phone Number: (705) 674-9252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CANDICE PERREAULT WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 27 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014