skip to content

Waltman, Laura Ruth

CPSO#: 91593

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3730 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

9 Lake Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Canada
Phone: (905)664-9992
Fax: (905)664-9910
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA RUTH WALTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 24 Apr 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014