skip to content

Walters, Leslea Angele

CPSO#: 88931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 Balmoral St
Winnipeg MB  R3C 4A8

Additional Practice Location(s)

665 William Ave
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0L8
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:23 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LESLEA ANGELE WALTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2021