skip to content

Walters, Anupama Alphie

CPSO#: 89214

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone: (647) 347-1227
Fax: (647) 277-9016 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Pallen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pallen ( CPSO# 74382 )
Dr. A. Walters ( CPSO# 89214 )

Business Address:
115 MacLean Place
Welland ON  L3B 5X9
Phone Number: (905) 714-7772


Corporation Name: Dr. Anupama Walters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walters ( CPSO# 89214 )

Business Address:
201-1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone Number: (647) 347-1227

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANUPAMA ALPHIE WALTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011