skip to content

Walsh, Sarah Kathleen

CPSO#: 98684

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018