skip to content

Walsh, Christopher James

CPSO#: 99189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Walsh and Hulme Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walsh ( CPSO# 99189 )
Dr. J. Hulme ( CPSO# 98363 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2014