skip to content

Walsh, Allyn Elizabeth

CPSO#: 30726

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa St
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: 905 575 1300 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walsh ( CPSO# 30726 )
Dr. W. Oczkowski ( CPSO# 51298 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLYN ELIZABETH WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2020