skip to content

Walman, Noah Samuel

CPSO#: 94577

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Picton Doctors Group
Suite 5A
389 Main St.
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: 6134767870
Fax: 6134766482 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Noah S. Walman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2019
Corporation Name: Noah S. Walman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Walman ( CPSO# 94577 )

Business Address:
5A-389 Main St
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: 613-476-7870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NOAH SAMUEL WALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012