Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Jan 2003
Summary:
On January 27, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Waller committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused six patients, engaged in acts of sexual impropriety, failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, had been convicted of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise medicine in that he has benn convicted of five counts of sexual assault under the Criminal Code; and commited acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In addition, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Waller to be incompetent in his care of patients and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of patients.
The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty; :
1) a reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2) revocation of the certificate of registration, effective immediately;
3) costs to the College in the amount of $1,500.00;
4) reimbursement to the College for funding for therapy and counselling for four of the patients (named in the Notice of Hearing) up to $7,000.00;
5) post security to guarantee payment of the amounts in [(4) above]
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 27, 2003
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jul 1975
Summary:
On July 7, 1975, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found Dr. Douglas Frederick Waller guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an improper association with a patient and directed that he be suspended from the Register of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario for a period of three months and that he pay costs in the amount of $1000.00. The suspension commenced July 7, 1975.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 07 Jul 1975