skip to content

Waller, Brittany Ann Marie

CPSO#: 97754

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dermatology on Bloor
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone: (416) 922-6869 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bertucci MedSpa
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: 905-850-4415
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

T & T Medical Clinic
#26 - 3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-7765
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brittany Waller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Waller ( CPSO# 97754 )

Business Address:
Dermatology on Bloor
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 922-9620

Business Address:
100-8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-4415

Business Address:
T & T Medical Clinic
26-3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone Number: (905) 761-7765

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRITTANY ANN MARIE WALLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017