skip to content

Walkes, Austin Cecil

CPSO#: 29803

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1295 Pearl Street
Beaumont TX  77701
United States
Phone: (409) 835-8533

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 4th Street
Port Arthur TX  77640
United States
Phone: 409-983-8384
Fax: 409-989-3681
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AUSTIN CECIL WALKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2008