skip to content

Walker, Laura Elizabeth

CPSO#: 100906

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
4 Cardinal Carter Wing, Rm 154
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6060 Ext. 6766
Fax: 416-352-1857 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Walker ( CPSO# 100906)

Business Address:
Room 154
4 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017