Walker, Kathryn Craigen (CPSO#: 99579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre Family
Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN CRAIGEN WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013