skip to content

Walker, John Duncan

CPSO#: 23864

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013