skip to content

Walker, James Douglas

CPSO#: 27420

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 May 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Civic Parkdale Clinic
Dermatology Centre, 4th floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walker ( CPSO# 27420 )
Dr. M. Walker ( CPSO# 31504 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
3rd Floor
333 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 5N4
Phone Number: (613) 560-7917

Business Address:
10 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ground East
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES DOUGLAS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1980