skip to content

Walker, Emily

CPSO#: 95861

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Leclair, Emily (used until: 14 Dec 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynecology
1053 Carling avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

152 Cleopatra drive, suite 101
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Canada
Phone: 613-728-6212
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:19 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective:17 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 25 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016