Walker, Douglas Robert (CPSO#: 33831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: (613) 548-2412
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Dept of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Providence Care Hospital
752 King St West
PO Box 603
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Brockvile General Hospital
Dept of Radiology
75 Charles St
Brockville, ON, K6V 1S8
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 613 345 5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Brockville General Hospital
Dept of Radiology
75 Charles St
Brockville, On, K6V 1S8
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 613 345 5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ROBERT WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1994