skip to content

Walker, Desmond

CPSO#: 21289

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 May 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:29 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2002