skip to content

Walker, Bradley Douglas

CPSO#: 97042

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Walker ( CPSO# 97042 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRADLEY DOUGLAS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 21 Dec 2015 to 17 Jan 2016
EL - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2018