skip to content

Wali, Dilip

CPSO#: 91349

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Calcutta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dilip Wali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wali ( CPSO# 91349 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 11 Jan 2021 Active
 (1 of 2)
As from January 1, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dilip Wali  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
of
DR. DILIP WALI
("Dr. Wali")
to the
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
__________________________________________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
 "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. 
(2)	I, Dr. Wali, certificate of registration number 91349, am a member of the College.  
(3)	I, Dr. Wali entered an undertaking with the College dated April 22, 2014 attached hereto as Appendix "A".
(4)	I, Dr. Wali sought a variation to the April 22, 2014 undertaking that was considered by the Inquiries Complaints and Reports Committee on December 17, 2020.
B.	UNDERTAKING VARIATION AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS
(5)	I, Dr. Wali, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective January 1, 2021 ("Effective Date").
(6)	Variation
a)	I, Dr. Wali , understand and agree that I remain bound by the terms of the  April 22, 2014 Undertaking with the exception of consultations that I conduct in the Emergency Department and/or in a Hospital Inpatient Setting.
C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(7)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(8)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(9)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(10)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
(11)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(12)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
(13)	Public Register
(a)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b)	I, Dr. Wali, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Effective April 22, 2014, Dr. Wali shall not engage in any professional encounters with female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a female regulated health professional approved by the College, and unless the other requirements provided in his Undertaking with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Wali may not be alone with any female patient, during any professional encounter.  

Effective January 1, 2021, the April 22, 2014 Undertaking is varied such that the terms are not applicable to consultations that Dr. Wali conducts in the Emergency Department or in a Hospital Inpatient Setting.

I understand that such specified terms, conditions and limitations shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the public.

CONSENT

(14)	I, Dr. Wali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(2 of 2)
 As  from  May  1,  2014,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Dilip  Wali,  in
            accordance  with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wali to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective  immediately,  Dr.  Wali  shall  not engage in any professional
                  encounters with female patients of any age,  in  any jurisdiction, unless
                  the patient encounter takes place in the presence  of  a female regulated
                  health  professional, and unless the other requirements provided  in  his
                  Undertaking  with  the  College  are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr.
                  Wali may not be alone with any female  patient,  during  any professional
                  encounter.
                  
                  
            --  Dr.  Dilip  Wali may practise medicine independently in internal  medicine,
            only.


Concerns

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: November 21, 2018
Summary: CONDITION(S) PLACED ON MEDICAL LICENSE PHYSICIAN REQUIRED TO NOTIFY BOARD OF INTENT TO PRACTICE CHAPERONE REQUIRED WHEN TREATING/EXAMINING FEMALE PATIENTS

 

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: November 21, 2018
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: _ _ On November 21, 2018, the Virginia Board of Medicine found that Dr. Wali had violated Virginia Code on the grounds of unprofessional conduct due to the restrictions and conditions imposed by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario on his Ontario certificate of registration. The Virginia Board ordered Dr. Wali not to engage in the practice of medicine and surgery with female patients in Virginia unless in the physical presence of a female chaperone approved by the Board. In addition, Dr. Wali was ordered to inform the Board upon completion of the requirements of the specified continuing education and remediation program required by CPSO. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on December 7, 2018.

 

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective July 19, 2019, Dr. Dilip Wali has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)