skip to content

Walgama, Babarenda Guruge Shiromi Dilrukshi

CPSO#: 87109

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0171
Fax: (519) 971-9120 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shiromi Walgama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Walgama ( CPSO# 87109 )

Business Address:
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BABARENDA GURUGE SHIROMI DILRUKSHI WALGAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALGAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010