skip to content

Walfish, Paul Gerald

CPSO#: 17226

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jul 1959

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 28-Jul-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Sinai Health System
413-600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Tel: (416) 586-4800 ext. 4437
Fax: (416) 5868861
Email: [email protected]
c/o pat. [email protected]
Date Received: 24 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018