skip to content

Waldman, Kyle Hart

CPSO#: 91604

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kyle Waldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Waldman ( CPSO# 91604 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLE HART WALDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Apr 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014