skip to content

Walderman, Kayla

CPSO#: 97981

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Vale, Kayla (used until: 06 Sep 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GSH - Annex Clinic
Second Floor
481 Bloor St W
Toronto ON  M5S 1X9
Phone: (416) 928-0217
Fax: (416) 964-1815 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

East Liberty Medical Centre
Suite 105
901 King St W
Toronto ON  M5V 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 599-6000
Fax: (416) 599-9731
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kayla Walderman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walderman ( CPSO# 97981 )

Business Address:
GSH - Annex Clinic
2nd Floor
481 Boor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1X9
Phone Number: (416) 928-0217

Business Address:
East Liberty Medical Centre
Suite 105
901 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 599-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAYLA WALDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014