skip to content

Wald, Joshua

CPSO#: 96118

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Room T2116
50 Charlton Ave. E. Hamilton On
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 37036
Fax: 905-521-6183 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joshua Wald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wald ( CPSO# 96118 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite T2116
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSHUA WALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015