skip to content

Wakely, Kathryn Anne

CPSO#: 30793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Allbay Rd.
Sidney BC  V8L 2N8
Phone: 2508806960

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Wakely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 22 2021
Corporation Name: Kathryn Wakely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Peter Wakely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wakely ( CPSO# 30793 )
Dr. P. Wakely ( CPSO# 30794 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE WAKELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAKELY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979