skip to content

Wakeham, Julia Christine

CPSO#: 88104

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Alanna Kalyniuk, Greenwood Medical Centre, Unit 10, 496 Discovery Avenue, Kingston, ON, K7K 7E9
Instructions: The majority of patient medical records for Dr. Wakeham can be accessed by contacting Dr. Alanna Kalyniuk
Date Received: 22 Sep 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 21 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 May 2018