skip to content

Waite, Melanie Marie Suzie

CPSO#: 97894

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Ottawa St, Suite 100
Morrisburg, ON
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: 613-543-4171 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: 6137742420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

2 Thorold Ln
Ingleside ON  K0C 1M0
Canada
Phone: 6135372044
Fax: 6135434171
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melanie Waite Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Waite ( CPSO# 97894 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone Number: (613) 543-2963

Business Address:
3 Thorold Lane
Ingleside ON  K0C 1M0
Phone Number: (613) 537-2044

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
30 Mille Roches Road
Long Sault ON  K1P 1P0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE MARIE SUZIE WAITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014