skip to content

Waisglass, Barry Ronald

CPSO#: 26501

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Canadian Cababis Clinics 2 - 80 King St St. Catherines ON L2R 7G1
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Barry Ronald Waisglass to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 7, 2017:

Dr. Waisglass has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.