skip to content

Wahid, Salman

CPSO#: 96900

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Oct 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lighthouse Arabia
821 Al Wasl Road, Al Safa 2
Dubai
Dubai 334273
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 01197104380208

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Salman Wahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wahid ( CPSO# 96900 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Paitents may contact: salmanwahid@hotmail.com
Date Received: 04 Feb 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014 Active
             Dr. Salman Wahid may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.