skip to content

Wahby, Allen James

CPSO#: 27315

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 May 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2020

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: January 6, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Allen James Wahby to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Wahby engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Wahby will engage in professional education prior to his resignation from the College, which will be effective May 23, 2020.
Download Full Document (PDF)