skip to content

Wahalawatta, Punsara Dasuni

CPSO#: 94566

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primacy Family First Health Centre
PO Box 91569
RPO Mer Bleu
Orléans ON  K1W 0A6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Primacy Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orléans ON  K4A 5E6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wahalawatta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 7 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
             Dr.  Punsara  Dasuni  Wahalawatta may practice medicine independently in Family
            Medicine, only.