skip to content

Wadhwa, Vikram Singh

CPSO#: 85294

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
826 King Street N
Waterloo ON  N2J 4G8
Phone: (519) 206-7777 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Radiology
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIKRAM SINGH WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Sep 2007
CF - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006