Wadhwa, Devina Maya (CPSO#: 98266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Wadhwa, Devina Dinesh (used until: 26 Oct 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 18076846000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devina Maya Wadhwa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wadhwa ( CPSO# 98266 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVINA MAYA WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017