skip to content

Wade, Philip Stanley

CPSO#: 24974

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 23 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Phillip S. Wade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 21 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records can call Dr. Wade at (613) 476-8170
Date Received: 23 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 18, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 14, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Philip Wade in respect of an incident that took place in 2004.