skip to content

Waddell, James Patterson

CPSO#: 21620

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6001
Fax: (416) 864-6010 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James P. Waddell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waddell ( CPSO# 21620 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6001


Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Atrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waddell ( CPSO# 21620 )
Dr. A. Atrey ( CPSO# 97167 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
804 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5392

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 02 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES PATTERSON WADDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADDELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1968