skip to content

Wall, William John

CPSO#: 28911

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William Wall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: October 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. William John Wall to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 15, 2018:

Dr. Wall has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.