skip to content

Hay, William John

CPSO#: 31330

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Dec 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: (613) 636-6175 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hay ( CPSO# 31330 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Rue Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN HAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1980