skip to content

Gormandy, Winston Derek Andre

CPSO#: 30963

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Winston Gormandy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Gormandy ( CPSO# 30963 )

Business Address:
Suite 2G
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 4E1
Phone Number: (647) 748-8011

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Centre Toronto, Ontario Westway Medical Clinic 1723 Kipling Ave Etobicoke, ON M9R 4E1
Date Received: 26 Jun 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Trinidad and Tobago

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020