skip to content

Daoud, Wala Mohamed

CPSO#: 101091

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle, Suite 104
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wala Daoud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Daoud ( CPSO# 101091)

Business Address:
Winston Park Family Physicians
104 - 2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WALA MOHAMED DAOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAOUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016