skip to content

Ateyah, Wameed

CPSO#: 81914

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 May 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bee Town Medical Centre
34 Main St W
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone: (905) 939-4600 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wameed Ateyah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ateyah ( CPSO# 81914 )

Business Address:
34 Main Street West
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone Number: (905) 939-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Apr 2020

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Ateyah’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Ateyah failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care of Patient A. It is also alleged that Dr. Ateyah engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A, including, but not limited to inappropriate and unprofessional communications with Patient A; obtaining a photograph of Patient A’s genital area through Facebook Messenger; and inappropriate and unprofessional communications with Patient A’s family member about his interactions with Patient A, including sharing personal health information without consent and attempting to interfere with Patient A’s concerns about his conduct. It is further alleged that Dr. Ateyah engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient B, including but not limited to, inappropriate and unprofessional communications with Patient B, and inappropriate and unprofessional communications with Patient B’s family member about his interactions with Patient B, including sharing Patient B’s personal health information without consent and attempting to interfere with Patient B’s concerns about his conduct. Furthermore, it is alleged that during a patient encounter with Patient B in his office, Dr. Ateyah breached a term, condition or limitation of his undertaking with the College requiring that a practice monitor be present for all in-person patient encounters with female patients of any age.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 15 Apr 2020 Active
             (1 or 2)
            As from April 15, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Wameed Ateyah in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ateyah to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                           DR. WAMEED ATEYAH
                                            ("Dr. Ateyah")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ateyah, certificate of registration number 81914, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College
                  conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1101022 (the
                  "Investigation") into my family practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this
                  Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person in regards
                  to the Investigation. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional
                        Encounter" or "Professional Encounters"), with patients of any age,
                        in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place
                        in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of
                        a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the
                        College (the "Practice Monitor" or "Practice Monitors"), and unless
                        the other requirements provided in this Undertaking are fulfilled.
                        For further clarity, I understand that I must not be alone with any
                        patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter,
                        whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                        present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to inform my patients of the indication
                        for any breast, pelvic, genital and/or rectal examination that I
                        may perform and to document the discussion in the corresponding
                        patient chart.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        (i)   providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                        (ii)  remaining present at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters, in person or otherwise, with all patients; 
                        (iii) carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including but not limited to physical and internal
                              examinations. I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure
                              the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                              Encounters with patients, including physical and internal
                              examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                        (iv)  refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A", while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with patients; 
                        (v)   maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log") and in the manner described in Appendix "A",
                              including listing the indication I described to my patient
                              for any breast, pelvic, genital or rectal examination
                              performed and confirming that I have documented the
                              discussion in the corresponding patient chart;
                        (vi)  initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                        (vii) submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the Log
                        by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to
                        make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (7)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting
                        rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out in Appendix "C" that states: Dr. Ateyah must not
                        have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients
                        of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the
                        continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Ateyah must not
                        be alone during any professional encounter with any patient.
                        Further information may be found on the College website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (7)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (7)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).
                  
            (8)   Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I
                        have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described
                        in section (6)(a), above.
                  
            (9)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        at least seven (7) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "D", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "E";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every week for a minimum of
                              four (4) weeks. At each visit during this initial period of
                              supervision, in addition to reviewing patient charts as
                              outlined below in (vi), the Clinical Supervisor shall
                              directly observe me perform a minimum of three (3) breast,
                              pelvic, genital and/or rectal examinations. 
                              If fewer than three (3) patients require breast, pelvic,
                              genital or rectal examinations during a given meeting, my
                              Clinical Supervisor will schedule a follow up meeting on
                              another day within the same week to conduct the required
                              observation;
                        (iv)  After a minimum of four (4) weeks of Clinical Supervision, if
                              my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a
                              reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor
                              will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another
                              location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks
                              for a further three (3) months; 
                        (v)   After a minimum of three (3) additional months of Clinical
                              Supervision, if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the
                              College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my
                              Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice
                              Location, or another location approved by the College, once
                              every month for a further three (3) months;
                        (vi)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                        (vii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                        (viii)Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (ix)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (x)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              week for the first month or until the College approves a
                              reduction in the level of supervision, then monthly for the
                              next three (3) months, or until the College approves a
                              further reduction in the level of supervision, and then one
                              further report at the end of Clinical Supervision, or more
                              frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my
                              standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "E", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessor
                        dated June 25, 2018 and October 10, 2018, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "D" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to ensure that Appendix "D" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "D" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (9)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (9)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (10)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "E", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   review, reflection and a written summary of:
                              1.    The Physical Examination. Campbell EW JR, Lynn CK; 
                              2.    "A Sensitive, Deliberate Approach to Draping".
                                    Dialogue, Volume 14 Issue 4 2018;
                              3.    CPSO's Medical Records policy; 
                              4.    CPSO's The Practice Guide: Medical Professionalism and
                                    College Policies;
                              5.    Cancer Care Ontario's Guidelines for screening for
                                    breast cancer and cervical cancer;
                              6.    CPSO's policy on Boundary Violations.  
                        (ii)  PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program - Canada, by receiving a
                              passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or
                              qualification.  I, Dr. Ateyah, will agree to abide by any
                              recommendations of the PROBE program;
                        (iii) CMPA e-learning modules: Documentation I and Documentation
                              II: Charting Medical Records; and
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (11)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (9)
                        above and Appendix "D" to this Undertaking, and the completion of
                        the Professional Education set out in section (10) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a
                        chart review, direct observation of a minimum of three (3) breast,
                        genital, rectal and/or pelvic examinations, and an interview with
                        me. The reassessment may also include interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (12)  Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "F". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
            (14)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (17)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College
            .
            (18)  I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ateyah, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted
                        into Dr. Ateyah's family medicine practice. As a result of the
                        investigation:
                  
                        Dr. Ateyah must not engage in any professional encounters, in
                        person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction,
                        unless the encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who
                        is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and
                        unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Ateyah's Undertaking
                        with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Ateyah
                        must not be alone with any patient during any professional
                        encounter. 
                  
                        Dr. Ateyah shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination
                        rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, that states: "Dr. Ateyah must not have
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of
                        any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to
                        the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Ateyah must
                        not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.
                        Further information may be found on the College website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca". 
                  
                        Dr. Ateyah will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 7 months. 
                  
                        Dr. Ateyah will engage in professional education, including in
                        maintaining professional boundaries, appropriate technique and
                        communication for intimate examinations, and medical
                        record-keeping.
                  
                        Dr. Ateyah's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision and professional education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Practice Monitors, Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Ateyah, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Practice
                  Monitors, Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Practice
                        Monitor's Undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking; 
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "D" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (e)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (f)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            (2 of 2)
            As from December 23, 2019, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Wameed
            Ateyah:

                  (i)   Dr. Ateyah shall comply with the College Policy "Closing a Medical
                        Practice", a copy of which is attached to this Order;
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Ateyah will participate in the Saegis Successful Patient
                        Interactions Course by receiving a passing evaluation or grade,
                        without any conditions or qualification. Dr. Ateyah will complete
                        the Saegis course within 6 months of the date of this Order and
                        will provide proof to the College of his completion, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. 

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:

On July 19, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wameed Ateyah committed 
 an act of professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession. 

 On a morning of a date in October 2016, Patient A attended Dr. Ateyah’s office as a 
 walk-in patient. She complained of back pain and some vaginal itchiness. Dr. Ateyah 
 examined Patient A. 

 The Committee found that Dr. Ateyah did not clearly communicate to Patient A in 
 advance the type of examination he intended to perform or the reasons for the 
 examination. In the result, Patient A was confused and did not understand what Dr. 
 Ateyah was doing or why he was doing it during the initial examination on the 
 examination table. 

 The Committee found that Dr. Ateyah failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession in not clearly explaining to Patient A the type of examination he intended to 
 conduct before embarking on the examination, and the reasons for conducting that 
 examination. 

 On October 7, 2019, the Committee heard submissions on penalty. The Committee 
 reserved its penalty decision. 

 On December 23, 2019, the Committee released its penalty decision: 

The Committee orders and directs on the matter of penalty and costs that:  

1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Ateyah’s certificate of registration for a period of two months, 
commencing on January 6, 2020 at 12:01 a.m;  

2.    The Registrar place the following terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. Ateyah’s 
certificate of registration: 

(i)   Dr. Ateyah shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”, a copy of 
which is attached to this Order; 

(ii)  Dr. Ateyah will participate in the Saegis Successful Patient Interactions Course by 
receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any conditions or qualification. Dr. Ateyah will 
complete the Saegis course within 6 months of the date of this Order and will provide proof to 
the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant 
assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it.  

3.    Dr. Ateyah shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded; and 

4.    Dr. Ateyah shall pay to the College costs in the amount of $20,550.00 within 60 days of 
the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 14-18, 2018 penalty hearing date: October 7, 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 15, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wameed Ateyah to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 15, 2020:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Ateyah’s family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Ateyah must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Ateyah’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Ateyah must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Ateyah shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Ateyah must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Ateyah must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Dr. Ateyah will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 7 months.

Dr. Ateyah will engage in professional education, including in maintaining professional boundaries, appropriate technique and communication for intimate examinations, and medical record-keeping.

Dr. Ateyah’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 8, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective August 2, 2018, Dr. Ateyah has completed his SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)